+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 5285.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On August 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3876.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3770.) (June 18).
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- May 20 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2020: Unfinished Business SB1220 Umberg Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
August 30, 2020: SB 1220 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 12
August 20, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
August 5, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
June 26, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB1220 Umberg
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 18, 2020: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 9, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 27, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor