+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4995.) (May 9).
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 9, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor