+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 18 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3592.) Reconsideration granted.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2016: [Second] hearing set for [04-19-2016]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor