+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 885, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4937.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5949.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3934.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3788.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3437.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3251.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (10)
August 22, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1216 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
August 18, 2022: SB 1216 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Berman
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
June 29, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 14, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2022: Special Consent SB1216
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
March 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor