+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 4815.) Reconsideration granted.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4717.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 24, 2018: [First] hearing set for [04-25-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor