+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 926, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4909.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6487.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6341.)
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on G.O.) suspended. (Page 5606.)
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and G.O.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3689.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3711.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3257.) (April 24).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3078.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and GOV. & F.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 27, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1211 Padilla Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 26, 2014: SB 1211 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREA
- Yeas: 79
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
June 25, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
June 23, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1211 Padilla
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor