+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 618, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5272.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 3871.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3788.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3542.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1207 Portantino Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 29, 2022: SB 1207 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
June 21, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1207 Portantino
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor