+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 729, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5922.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (August 11).
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 4048.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3497.) (April 11).
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 18, 2016: SB 1203 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By BONTA
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
June 22, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1203 Hertzberg
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 25, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 11, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor