+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 693, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4879.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6402.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6282.)
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25).
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3643.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3257.) (April 24).
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 26, 2014: Unfinished Supp 1 SB1203 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
August 25, 2014: SB 1203 Jackson Senate Third Reading By CHAU
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1203 Jackson
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
April 24, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2