+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: That the measure be held in committee pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6097.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 6885.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6884.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 6561.)
- Assembly Rule 63 and 69 suspended.
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On March 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 24. Noes 0.) (March 5).
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From inactive file.
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 9.) (September 14).
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (Corrected October 10).
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- September 11 hearing postponed by committee.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2825.)
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 31, 2018: That the measure be held in committee pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10
- Yeas: 7
August 29, 2018: SB 120 Roth Senate Third Reading By FRIEDMAN
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
August 24, 2018: SB 120 Senate Third Reading By FRIEDMAN Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 7
September 14, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
May 11, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB120 B. & F.R.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5