+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 226, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5222.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4628.) (April 10).
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 9, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1199 Wilk et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
July 5, 2018: SB 1199 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
June 27, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 3, 2018: Consent Calendar SB1199
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor