+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Held under submission.
- Set, second hearing.
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3666.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3711.) (May 23).
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3340.) (April 30).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1196 Liu
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 19, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 30, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor