+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 696, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5865.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6580.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4454.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4306.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4815.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 28, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1196 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2018: SB 1196 Jackson Senate Third Reading By CHAU
- Yeas: 80
August 8, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 26, 2018: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
June 19, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
May 31, 2018: Special Consent SB1196
- Yeas: 39
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor