+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor