+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5272.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3824.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3544.) (April 27).
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 28 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1194 Allen Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 29, 2022: SB 1194 Allen Senate Third Reading By Ward
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 10
June 21, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1194 Allen
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 27, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor