+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4231.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 14.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 4822.) (April 24).
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1184 Pan
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor