+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 993, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5084.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 5996.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 28).
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3828.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3326.) (April 5).
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 24, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1184 Cortese et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 22, 2022: SB 1184 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Lee
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 9
June 21, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1184 Cortese et al.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor