+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on PUB. S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.