+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On September 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 577, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4991.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 16. Page 6708.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.)
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6344.)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (June 24).
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3643.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3711.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3280.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2014: SB 1182 Leno Senate Third Reading By BONTA
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
August 29, 2014: Unfinished Supp 3 SB1182 Leno Concurrence
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 5
August 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 6
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1182 Leno
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 7
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 5, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor