+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6402.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6282.)
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 5847.)
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on ED.) suspended. (Page 5606.)
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3416.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 29).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2976.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 26, 2014: Unfinished Supp 1 SB1177 Steinberg Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 25, 2014: SB 1177 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN
- Yeas: 79
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education.
- Yeas: 7
May 8, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd SB1177 Steinberg
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
April 29, 2014: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
March 26, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor