+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 6020.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 29.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 6013.)
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5880.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 6596.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 20 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4408.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4305.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4817.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4622.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and L. & I.R.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
August 30, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1177 Portantino Concurrence
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
August 29, 2018: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 27, 2018: SB 1177 Portantino Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 3
August 16, 2018: No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
August 16, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
June 26, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 18, 2018: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1177 Portantino
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 7, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
April 11, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor