+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5489.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6233.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5963.)
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4047.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3494.) (April 12).
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 29, 2016: Unfinished Business SB1176 Galgiani Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
August 24, 2016: SB 1176 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E.
- Yeas: 80
August 19, 2016: SB 1176 Galgiani Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 20
June 21, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1176 Galgiani
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 12, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1