+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4605.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 10, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12