+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5978.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5088.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4997.) (May 8).
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 17 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 3 hearing postponed by committee.
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4418.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 20.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 25, 2018: SB 1173 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 13, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
May 17, 2018: Consent Calendar SB1173 Vidak
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2018: Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
March 20, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor