+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4105.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27).
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3643.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3335.) (March 30).
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 30.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1170 Wieckowski
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 23, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 20, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
March 30, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor