+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5703.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 1).
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 26, 2014: SB 1167 Hueso Senate Third Reading By CHAU
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
April 24, 2014: Special Consent #12 SB1167 Hueso
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 1, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor