+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 559, Statutes of 2022.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3864.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3786.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3514.) (April 26).
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3309.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1162 Limón et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 29, 2022: SB 1162 Limón Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 12
June 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 14, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1162 Limón et al.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 16, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
April 4, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor