+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3457.) (April 20).
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 20, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor