+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 3895.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 4975.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4973.)
On June 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 676.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 29, 2020: Unfinished Business SB116 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
June 26, 2020: SB 116 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
April 11, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB116 B. & F.R.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor