+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on the inactive file.
On September 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5419.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- July 27 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On July 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- July 13 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On June 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3818.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3769.) (June 18).
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3622.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 29.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on PUB. S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
On April 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on EQ. and PUB. S.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 31, 2020: SB 1156 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 30, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
June 24, 2020: Special Consent SB1156
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 18, 2020: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
June 9, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor