+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6165.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3324.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3120.) (April 8).
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 19, 2014: SB 1153 Leno Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
June 24, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Longterm Care to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1153 Leno
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
April 8, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor