+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governors veto died on file.
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4547.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6048.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 16).
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3436.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3386.) (May 5).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 18, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1151 Cannella Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 14, 2014: SB 1151 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 16, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
May 12, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1151 Cannella
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
May 5, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1