+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3493.) (April 12).
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
April 12, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor