+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 2, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor