+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6060.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6803.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4454.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4305.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 14.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4556.) (April 4).
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1148 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2018: SB 1148 Pan Senate Third Reading By MAYES
- Yeas: 80
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
June 19, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
May 31, 2018: Special Consent SB1148
- Yeas: 39
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 14, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 4, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor