+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
On August 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On August 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- July 30 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- July 22 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3841.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3769.) (June 18).
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3583.) (May 22).
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2020: SB 1141 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 30, 2020: Unfinished Business SB1141 Rubio et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 18, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
August 12, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 25, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB1141 Rubio et al.
- Yeas: 40
June 18, 2020: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 9, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 22, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor