+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On September 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 5400.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (August 29).
On August 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 6176.)
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 6115.)
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Stone.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3672.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3440.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1137 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
August 30, 2022: SB 1137 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By BRYAN
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 10
August 29, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
August 24, 2022: SB 1137 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Bryan Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 8
June 22, 2022: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
June 8, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2022: Consent Calendar SB1137
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
April 19, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor