+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4454.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4517.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 2
May 31, 2018: Special Consent SB1132
- Yeas: 39
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 16, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 3, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Allen
Type:
Primary Sponsor