+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 896, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6115.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 6069.)
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6800.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4453.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4623.) (April 11).
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1130 Leyva et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2018: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 7
August 29, 2018: SB 1130 Leyva Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY
- Yeas: 80
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
June 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2018: Special Consent SB1130
- Yeas: 39
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 30, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1