+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 619, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4870.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6403.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6154.)
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 6).
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24).
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On January 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 2662.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2644.) (January 23).
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 23.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 388.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 26, 2014: Unfinished Supp 1 SB113 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
August 25, 2014: SB 113 Jackson Senate Third Reading By MULLIN
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 4
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB113 Jackson
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 7
January 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 2, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1