+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governors veto died on file.
On September 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4967.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 6575.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6345.)
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 3670.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3709.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3119.) (April 9).
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- (Corrected March 12.)
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1129 Steinberg Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
August 27, 2014: SB 1129 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 4
June 25, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 18, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development.
- Yeas: 9
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1129 Steinberg
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 5, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 9, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1