+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2022.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5335.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3863.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3784.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3168.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 21.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2022: SB 1127 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Grayson
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 10
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1127 Atkins et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1127 Atkins et al.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor