+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5).
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3681.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3569.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 24.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 30, 2020: SB 1123 Chang Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 30, 2020: Unfinished Business SB1123 Chang Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 5, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
June 11, 2020: Consent Calendar SB1123
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2020: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor