+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 23).
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and A. & A.R.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3601.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3709.) (May 23).
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3256.) (April 24).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
June 23, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
June 12, 2014: Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1121 De León
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 19, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor