+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2923.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 3464.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
September 13, 2019: Unfinished Business SB112 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 11
September 12, 2019: SB 112 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 5
April 11, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB112 B. & F.R.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor