+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5862.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6586.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4336.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 14 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 14.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3).
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 28, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1110 Bradford Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2018: SB 1110 Bradford Senate Third Reading By DAHLE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
August 8, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 25, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1110 Bradford
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
April 3, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor