+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS, ED., and JUD.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor