+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 447, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2793.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1293.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1147.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1702.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 11.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 2, 2015: SB 111 Fuller Senate Third Reading By LACKEY
- Yeas: 80
August 27, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
July 1, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB111 Fuller
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 11, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor