+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2976.) (March 26).
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor