+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29).
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On June 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 15 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 3837.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3783.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3459.) (April 20).
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3219.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 24 in HOUSING pending receipt.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (7)
June 29, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
May 23, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1105 Hueso
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 20, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
March 24, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor